This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 07:13:32 (UTC).

Webster vs. Alcazar

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Webster filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Alcazar. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Webster, Gregory

Defendant

Alcazar, Ramon

Intervenor

Loya Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANK, DEIRDRE BARKLEY

Intervenor Attorney

Hill, Geoffrey T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Statement of Damages (Sub Served Maria Alcazar. STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Webster, Gregory on 10/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Change of Lead Counsel) filed by Loya Casualty Insurance Company on 10/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Loya Casualty Insurance Company on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketHill, Geoffrey T added as a effective 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAnswer -In- Intervention filed by Loya Casualty Insurance Company on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketLoya Casualty Insurance Company added as a Intervenor effective 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Maria Alcazar) filed by Webster, Gregory on 07/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Maria Alcazar) submitted by Webster, Gregory rejected on 07/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Webster, Gregory on 05/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Webster, Gregory on 05/07/2021. Filed By: Webster, Gregory(Plaintiff) Refers To: Alcazar, Ramon(Defendant) | Loya Casualty Insurance Company(Intervenor)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HILL GEOFFREY T.