Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 06/20/2021 at 08:12:08 (UTC).

Waterproofing vs. Willison

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 Waterproofing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Willison. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Willison, Art W Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

RING, BART I.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KIRKNER, DONNA E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross Complaint) filed by Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc on 03/15/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Willison, Art W Jr on 02/19/2021. Filed By: Willison, Art W Jr(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc(Cross - Defendant) | American Contractors Indemnity Company(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAmerican Contractors Indemnity Company added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Willison, Art W Jr on 02/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Non Service filed by Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Date of service: 12/19/2020. cost: 69.50) filed by Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Regarding Non Service filed by Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc on 12/02/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc on 12/02/2020. Filed By: Waterproofing and Roofing Solutions Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Willison, Art(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RING BART IVAN