This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 00:44:58 (UTC).

Warden vs Williamson

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 Warden filed an Other lawsuit against Williamson. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

Warden, Scott Charles

Williamson, Linda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Respondent Attorney

BAYLEY, GUY R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders has been Dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order dissolved.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Denied) filed by Williamson, Linda on 05/23/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (OF RESPONSE EA-120) filed by Williamson, Linda on 05/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketResponse to Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Williamson, Linda on 05/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Williamson, Linda on 05/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Williamson, Linda on 05/19/2022. Filed By: Williamson, Linda(Petitioner) Refers To: Warden, Scott(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Hearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketHearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketRequest to Continue Court Hearing filed by Williamson, Linda on 04/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Respondent's Request for Continuance) filed by Williamson, Linda on 04/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Williamson, Linda on 04/26/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (EA-100 Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders, EA-109 Notice of Court Hearing, Declaration Re Ex Parte Notice, etc) filed by Warden, Scott Charles on 04/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketHearing on Request for Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse Restraining Orders - scheduled for 04/26/2022 at 01:30:00 PM in 32 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Denied) filed by Warden, Scott Charles on 03/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketWilliamson, Linda added as a Respondent effective 03/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 32.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Re Ex Parte Notice VN028 filed by Warden, Scott Charles on 03/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Warden, Scott Charles on 03/28/2022. Filed By: Warden, Scott Charles(Petitioner) Refers To: Williamson, Linda(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD