This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 03:43:42 (UTC).

Village On The Green VS McCreary

Case Summary

On 01/09/2012 Village On The Green filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against McCreary. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLAGE ON THE GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

McCreary, Elaine

McCreary, Jason

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Description: requested by pltf; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • DocketCase File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 02/17/2012 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketCourt ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for dismissal after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2012
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for dismissal after mediation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (roommate Peyman Afshar $35) filed by VILLAGE ON THE GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 01/30/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (spouse Jason McCreary $35) filed by VILLAGE ON THE GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 01/30/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - requested by pltf scheduled for 02/17/2012 at 08:15:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • DocketCase assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2012
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by VILLAGE ON THE GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION on 01/09/2012. Filed By: VILLAGE ON THE GREEN HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION(Plaintiff) Refers To: McCreary, Jason(Defendant) | McCreary, Elaine(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Village on the Green Homeowners Association is a litigant