Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 04:29:50 (UTC).

Victor Rodriguez vs. David Velasco

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 Victor Rodriguez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against David Velasco. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodriguez, Victor

Defendant

Velasco, David

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Mail Returned Undeliverable (Notice of Entry of Judgment dated 8/19/2015 returned Unclaimed) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 09/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Mail Returned Undeliverable (notice of entry of judgment returned not deliverable as addressed unable to forward) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 08/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Mail Returned Undeliverable (Notice of Entry of Judgment returned In sufficient Address) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 08/27/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Judgment for Rodriguez, Victor against Velasco, David in the amount of: 2150.00 principal, punitive damages, 50.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 08/17/2015. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 08/17/2015 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Victor Rodriguez, DBA Neon Plus Signs and AGAINST David Velasco, DBA Healthy Sparks in the amount of $2150.00 principal, $50.00 costs. Judgment Details: None. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute ($0.00 fee, served to Brian Velasco, son of David Velasco on 7/18/15 at 10:15 am. mailed 8/10/15) filed by Rodriguez, Victor on 08/13/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/17/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Fictitious Business Name Declaration filed by Rodriguez, Victor on 07/09/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Rodriguez, Victor on 07/09/2015. Filed By: Rodriguez, Victor(Plaintiff) Refers To: Velasco, David(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less