This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 11:55:36 (UTC).

Vicencio VS PF Changs

Case Summary

On 04/14/2014 Vicencio filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PF Changs. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vicencio, Elizabeth

Defendants

Henderson, Matthew

PF Changs China Bistro Inc

PF Changs III LLC

Pescadero, Gerardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirschen, Leonard

Defendant Attorney

WALLACE, DONALD B.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Description: to assess where the parties are at in the arbitration process; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Description: to assess where the parties are at in the arbitration process; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Description: to assess where the parties are at in the arbitration process; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Description: to assess where the parties are at in the arbitration process; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Conference re Binding Arbitration; Description: RE Binding Arbitration; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2014
  • Stipulation and Order (Joint Stipulation and Order to Arbitrate) filed by PF Changs China Bistro Inc; Vicencio, Elizabeth on 07/29/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • Status Conference - RE Binding Arbitration scheduled for 12/08/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2014
  • Answer filed by Henderson, Matthew; Pescadero, Gerardo on 06/06/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Vicencio, Elizabeth on 06/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (by serving Jan Lapinid process clerk and authorized to accept) filed by Vicencio, Elizabeth on 05/28/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (and STATEMENT OF DAMAGES, served Vivian Imperial, auth to accept) filed by Vicencio, Elizabeth on 05/16/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/12/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vicencio, Elizabeth on 04/14/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2014
  • Complaint (Labor code 1102.5, 2856, 98.6) filed by Vicencio, Elizabeth on 04/14/2014. Filed By: Vicencio, Elizabeth(Plaintiff) Refers To: PF Changs China Bistro Inc(Defendant) | PF Changs III LLC(Defendant) | Henderson, Matthew(Defendant) | Pescadero, Gerardo(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less