Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:29 (UTC).

University Glen Corp vs. Eric Arteaga

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 University Glen Corp filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Eric Arteaga. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

University Glen Corp

Defendant

Arteaga, Eric

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evans, Chris J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2017
  • Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Writ of Possession Returned (satisfied) filed by University Glen Corp on 12/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Judgment for University Glen Corp against Arteaga, Eric in the amount of: 1755.60 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 425.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 450.00 attorney fees entered on 09/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Court filed by University Glen Corp on 09/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2014
  • Declaration and Order that Copy be Accepted in Lieu of Original Document filed by University Glen Corp on 09/05/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • Declaration and Worksheet for Default Judgment-Unlawful Detainer filed by University Glen Corp on 08/26/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by University Glen Corp on 08/26/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Writ issued on 07/24/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Application for Writ of Possession filed by University Glen Corp on 07/24/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • Judgment for University Glen Corp against Arteaga, Eric in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 07/25/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk for Possession Only filed by University Glen Corp on 07/24/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Default entered as to Arteaga, Eric on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by University Glen Corp on 07/24/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by University Glen Corp on 07/24/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 48.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by University Glen Corp on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by University Glen Corp on 06/27/2014. Filed By: University Glen Corp(Plaintiff) Refers To: Arteaga, Eric(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less