This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 22:25:37 (UTC).

Unicare Diagnostics Inc vs. Victor Segura

Case Summary

On 04/17/2013 Unicare Diagnostics Inc filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Victor Segura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Unicare Diagnostics Inc

Friedman, Darren

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Helliesen, John

Segura, Victor

Whittier Medical Homecare Supply Inc

Respiratory Care Consultants Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Saravia, Vartan

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KRAKAUER, FRED

Barry, Clifford N

Ostrove, Steven M

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Change of Venue (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Strike; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion To Compel Production Of Documents; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
295 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2013
  • Opposition and Objection by Defendants filed by counsel Clifford N. Barry.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Ex Parte - Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order re Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 04/30/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Order - Other (re Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause) received from Unicare Diagnostics Inc on 04/25/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Declaration - Other (in Support of Plaintiffs Application for Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Unicare Diagnostics Inc on 04/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Ex Parte - Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order re Preliminary Injunction scheduled for 04/25/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order re Preliminary Injunction) filed by Unicare Diagnostics Inc on 04/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/20/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Unicare Diagnostics Inc on 04/17/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2013
  • Complaint filed by Unicare Diagnostics Inc on 04/17/2013. Filed By: Unicare Diagnostics Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Segura, Victor(Defendant) | Helliesen, John(Defendant) | Whittier Medical Homecare Supply Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less