This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:42:23 (UTC).

Turpel vs State of California DMV

Case Summary

On 02/03/2017 Turpel filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against State of California DMV. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Turpel, Peter James

Respondents

State of California Department of Motor Vehicles

Jean Shiomoto Director of the California Department of Motor Vehicles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wilfert, Roslynn M.

Respondent Attorney

Mesi, Stephen A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 13; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 46; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 46; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 46; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 46; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 13; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate; Event Status: REASSIGNED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles on 12/04/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Judgment for State of California Department of Motor Vehicles against Turpel, Peter James in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 435.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 11/05/2018. see judgment for details

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Judgment by Court After Hearing (Judgment Denying Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed by State of California Department of Motor Vehicles on 11/05/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate heard 01/25/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate - scheduled for 12/20/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in 13 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Amount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 11/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Motion for Peremptory Writ of Mandate filed by Turpel, Peter James on 11/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Answer (to Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate) filed by Jean Shiomoto Director of the California Department of Motor Vehicles on 08/15/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Jean Shiomoto Director of the California Department of Motor Vehicles added as a Respondent effective 08/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Notice of Lodging (Administrative Records) filed by Turpel, Peter James on 07/21/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Proof of Service - Mailing filed by Turpel, Peter James on 02/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Turpel, Peter James on 02/03/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Turpel, Peter James on 02/03/2017. Filed By: Turpel, Peter James(Petitioner) Refers To: State of California Department of Motor Vehicles(Respondent) | Jean Shiomoto Director of the California Department of Motor Vehicles(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESI STEPHEN A. DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL