This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 11:21:30 (UTC).

Tricoast Builders vs Frederick

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 Tricoast Builders filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Frederick. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Tricoast Builders Inc

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Frederick, Kelly A

Farmers Insurance Exchange

Athens, Timothy G

Pennymac Corp

Mid Century Insurance Company

Tricoast Builders Inc

Connette, Michael

Rob's Plumbing

American Contractors Indemnity Company

Paul Payne Roofing & Painting

Vincent, Robert

Got Tile ?

Legacy Construction

Simi-Valley Roofing

Del Monte Cabinets

West Coast Construction and Development

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorney

Connette, Michael

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GOAD, DIANE L

Bubman, Michael E.

DEAN, SEAN B.

Connette, Michael

Crawford, Anthony J.

MERLUZA, RICARDO Y

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:53 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:53 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
187 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Tricoast Builders Inc on 07/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Tricoast Builders Inc on 07/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Gabriela Sanchez CT Corp) filed by Tricoast Builders Inc on 07/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Answer (to Complaint) filed by Mid Century Insurance Company on 07/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Mid Century Insurance Company added as a Defendant effective 07/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed by Tricoast Builders Inc on 06/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/23/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tricoast Builders Inc on 05/19/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Complaint filed by Tricoast Builders Inc on 05/19/2017. Filed By: Tricoast Builders Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Frederick, Kelly(Defendant) | Athens, Timothy(Defendant) | Farmers Insurance Exchange(Defendant) | Pennymac Corp(Defendant) | Mid Century Insurance Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tricoast Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where PENNYMAC CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FARMERS INSURANCE EXCHANGE A SUBSIDIARY OF FARMERS INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant