Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 14:03:52 (UTC).

Tri-Tech Restoration vs. Hernandez

Case Summary

On 08/20/2020 Tri-Tech Restoration filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Hernandez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tri Tech Restoration & Construction Co Inc

Defendants

Lisa Hernandez as Trustee of the Hernandez Family Trust

Hernandez, Lisa

Joe Hernandez as Trustee of the Hernandez Family Trust

Hernandez, Joe

Joe Hernandez and Lisa Hernandez, as individuals and as Trustees

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BATES, JAMES W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous (conformed original of recorded notice of pendency action) filed by Tri Tech Restoration & Construction Co Inc on 09/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Tri Tech Restoration & Construction Co Inc on 09/30/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Joe Hernandez and Lisa Hernandez, as individuals and as Trustees on 09/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketJoe Hernandez and Lisa Hernandez, as individuals and as Trustees added as a Defendant effective 09/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/21/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tri Tech Restoration & Construction Co Inc on 08/20/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Tri Tech Restoration & Construction Co Inc on 08/20/2020. Filed By: Tri Tech Restoration & Construction Co Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Lisa Hernandez as Trustee of the Hernandez Family Trust dated January 17 2010(Defendant) | Hernandez, Lisa(Defendant) | Joe Hernandez as Trustee of the Hernandez Family Trust dated January 17 2010(Defendant) | Hernandez, Joe(Defendant) | Joe Hernandez and Lisa Hernandez, as individuals and as Trustees(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tri Tech Restoration Co Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BATES JAMES WILLIAM