Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/03/2021 at 07:46:35 (UTC).

Trejo vs. Total Distribution Service

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Trejo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Total Distribution Service. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trejo, Ricardo

Defendant

Total Distribution Service Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schmidt, Fletcher W

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:28 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 11:46 AM; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 04/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDesignated as an exceptional action on 04/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Time: 1:28 PM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for heard 04/20/2021 01:28:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 11:46 AM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 04/14/2021 11:46:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 21 effective 04/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Prejudice CCP 170.6 (Judge Mark Borrell) filed by Trejo, Ricardo on 04/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons issued on 04/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Trejo, Ricardo on 04/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Trejo, Ricardo on 04/09/2021. Filed By: Trejo, Ricardo(Plaintiff) Refers To: Total Distribution Service Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Total Distribution Service Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHMIDT FLETCHER W. H.