This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 06:06:30 (UTC).

Traci Martinez vs. William Lyon Homes Inc

Case Summary

On 11/04/2013 Traci Martinez filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against William Lyon Homes Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martinez, Traci

Defendants

Residential Fire Systems Inc

Trak Plumming Inc

William Lyon Homes Inc

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2017
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant Unserved (Certified Mail returned unclaimed, unable to forward 01/04/14) filed by Martinez, Traci on 01/21/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 01/06/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Other court dismissal - Conditional or Good Faith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2014
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Other court dismissal - Conditional or Good Faith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2013
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk (signed by ty a maley on 12.13.13 cost 15.00) filed by Martinez, Traci on 12/19/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • Proof of Service of Defendant's Claim and Order to Plaintiff - Certified Mail by Clerk (Signed by illegible on 11/06/13; costs 15.00) filed by Martinez, Traci on 11/06/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • 3 certified mailings sent out ... 7196 9008 9111 7772 8324 Residential Fire 7196 9008 9111 7772 8348 Trak Plumming 7196 9008 9111 7772 8331 William Lyon Homes 11/04/13 RJ (Simi)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 01/06/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Martinez, Traci on 11/04/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Martinez, Traci on 11/04/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Martinez, Traci on 11/04/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Martinez, Traci on 11/04/2013. Filed By: Martinez, Traci(Plaintiff) Refers To: William Lyon Homes Inc(Defendant) | Trak Plumming Inc(Defendant) | Residential Fire Systems Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESIDENTIAL FIRE SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM LYON HOMES INC. is a litigant