This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/12/2018 at 10:26:15 (UTC).

Toxina King vs. Green Thumb International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2010 Toxina King filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Green Thumb International, Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

King, Toxina

Defendant

Green Thumb International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSBORNE, BRIAN A.

Defendant Attorney

CRISLER, TED R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2011
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • DocketCase File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by King, Toxina on 05/06/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2011
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Green Thumb International, Inc. on 03/24/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • DocketCase Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 04/25/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by King, Toxina on 03/09/2011.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • DocketCase Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 04/25/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2010
  • DocketAnswer filed by Green Thumb International, Inc. on 12/15/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2010
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served upon Terry Brayton Hawley, corp office mgr for Agent H.D. Bergguist Jr. and by mail) filed by King, Toxina on 11/29/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by King, Toxina on 11/09/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketDeclaration for Court Assignment filed by King, Toxina on 11/09/2010.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by King, Toxina on 11/09/2010. Filed By: King, Toxina(Plaintiff) Refers To: Green Thumb International, Inc.(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less