This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 08/20/2023 at 11:04:35 (UTC).

Tina D Gonzalez vs. Alfred C Beserra

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 Tina D Gonzalez filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Alfred C Beserra. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************CUOE

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gonzalez, Tina D

Defendants

Beserra, Alfred C

Beserra, Judith M

Judith M Beserra as a Trustee of the Alfred C Beserra and Teresa P Beserra Trust

Judith M Bessera Trustee of the Alfred C Beserra and Teresa P Beserra Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ramirez, Gregory J.

Defendant Attorney

Michie, Douglas Charles

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (Substituted Service); Filed by: Gonzalez, Tina D (Plaintiff); As to: Beserra, Alfred C (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Cost Waived: No; Mailing Date: 02/20/2023

03/21/2023: Proof of Service (Substituted Service); Filed by: Gonzalez, Tina D (Plaintiff); As to: Beserra, Alfred C (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Cost Waived: No; Mailing Date: 02/20/2023

Answer; Filed by: Beserra, Alfred C (Defendant); Judith M Bessera Trustee of the Alfred C Beserra and Teresa P Beserra Trust (Defendant)

03/21/2023: Answer; Filed by: Beserra, Alfred C (Defendant); Judith M Bessera Trustee of the Alfred C Beserra and Teresa P Beserra Trust (Defendant)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show CauseRe Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to FileProof of Service/Default; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2024
  • HearingName: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Status: Scheduled; Department: Dept 22B / Hall of Justice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Beserra, Alfred C (Defendant); Judith M Bessera Trustee of the Alfred C Beserra and Teresa P Beserra Trust (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service (Substituted Service):; Service Cost: 0.00; Cost Waived: No; Mailing Date: 02/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Substituted Service); Filed by: Gonzalez, Tina D (Plaintiff); As to: Beserra, Alfred C (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Cost Waived: No; Mailing Date: 02/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Gonzalez, Tina D on 03/14/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/08/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Granted in Full) filed by Gonzalez, Tina D on 01/20/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketGonzalez, Tina D Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs has been granted in full.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Gonzalez, Tina D on 01/20/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSummons issued on 01/20/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gonzalez, Tina D on 01/20/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint filed by Gonzalez, Tina D on 01/20/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less