This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 21:42:22 (UTC).

Tiger Bass Properties LLC vs. Greg De La Cerda

Case Summary

On 03/29/2013 Tiger Bass Properties LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Greg De La Cerda. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiger Bass Properties LLC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

De La Cerda, Greg

American Financial Realty and Mortgage Company

Grillo, David

Aivazian, Alen

Wells Fargo Bank NA Successor by Merger to Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc

Countrywide Home Mortgage Inc

Ticor Title Company of California

Wells Fargo Home Mortgage

Countrywide Home Loans Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Kenneth H.

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MORRIS, STEVEN

NAZARI, SHAWNA S

MARTIN, PAUL T.

Gerardo, Jeffrey S.

Katcherian, Amy L

Campbell, J. Owen

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Service of Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Service of Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Service of Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Service of Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 2:02 PM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Service of Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Hearing Re: Service of Cross-Complaint; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2013
  • Request for Judicial Notice (in support of Application for Prelim Injunc) filed by Tiger Bass Properties LLC on 04/16/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2013
  • Supplemental (submittal and summary of evidence in support of application for Prelim Injunction) filed by Tiger Bass Properties LLC on 04/16/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/12/2013 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction is scheduled for 05/03/2013 at 08:20 AM in Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction - scheduled for 05/03/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Ex Parte - TRO re sale of property scheduled for 04/12/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 43 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2013
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (for TRO and OSC) filed by Tiger Bass Properties LLC on 04/11/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/04/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • Complaint filed by Tiger Bass Properties LLC on 03/29/2013. Filed By: Tiger Bass Properties LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: De La Cerda, Greg(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less