This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 07:10:10 (UTC).

Thompson vs. Air & Liquid Systems

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Thompson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Air & Liquid Systems Corp individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps Inc

Argo Packing Co

Arvinmeritor Inc

BW IP Inc

Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC as Successor by Merger to Borg Warner Corporation

Carlisle Corporation

Caterpillar Inc

Chevron USA Inc

ConocoPhillips Company

Crane Co individually and as successor in interest to Stockham Valves & Fittings Company Chapman Valve Mfg Co and Alloy Steel Products Co

Crosby Valve Inc

Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc as successor in interest to Mundet Cork Company

Cummins Inc

DCo LLC

Drilling Specialties Company LLC a division of ConocoPhillips Company

Eaton Corporation

FMC Corporation

Familian Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Familian Pipe & Supply

Flowserve Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Duramentallic Corp Edward Valves and Pacific Pumps

Gardner Denver Inc individually and as successor in interest to Joy Manufacturing Co

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J.

Milbrodt, Jeremy D

Ameele, Keith M.

Akopyan, Hilda A

Goetz, Andy J.

Remillard, Thomas W

JACKSON, GABRIEL A.

Nichols, Stephen M.

BERKES, ROBERT H

Other Attorneys

Fishback, Stephen M.

Davis, Geoffrey M.

Olson, Dean A.

FOLEY, PATRICK J.

Sharp, Gary D

LONG, JAYME C

SARNO, JUSTIN READE

JENKINS, CHARLES W.

Dejardin, Bradford J.

POND, FRANK D.

Rasmussen, Jennifer C

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:10 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:10 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Jury Trial (LC); Description: [2 month time estimate in person/longer via Zoom]; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: CMC: Complex Track; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Pretrial Conference (CCM); Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Description: re: Proof of Service on defendants Caterpillar and The Nash Engineering Co.; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Ex Parte; Description: Ex Parte for OST for plaintiff to file discovery responses; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Re Defendants Ex Parte Application for an Order Permitting the Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment Adjudication within 30 Days of Trial) filed by Mechanical Drives & Belting; ConocoPhillips Company on 11/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/17/2021 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEx-parte application for OST for Plaintiff to File Discovery Responses requested by defendant NOV Inc is denied without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
363 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Mechanical Drives & Belting on 07/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketRemillard, Thomas W added as a effective 07/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint submitted by ITT Inc rejected on 07/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketITT Inc added as a Defendant effective 07/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Naming DOE 1 ITT Inc nka ITT LLC) filed by Thompson, Marcia; Thompson, Warren on 07/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc on 07/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCrown Cork & Seal Company Inc added as a Defendant effective 07/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, Warren; Thompson, Marcia on 06/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Thompson, Warren; Thompson, Marcia on 06/10/2021. Filed By: Thompson, Warren(Plaintiff) | Thompson, Marcia(Plaintiff) Refers To: Gardner Denver Inc individually and as successor in interest to Joy Manufacturing Co(Defendant) | Crane Co individually and as successor in interest to Stockham Valves & Fittings Company Chapman Valve Mfg Co and Alloy Steel Products Co(Defendant) | FMC Corporation(Defendant) | ConocoPhillips Company(Defendant) | Chevron USA Inc(Defendant) | Caterpillar Inc(Defendant) | Carlisle Corporation(Defendant) | BW IP Inc(Defendant) | Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC as Successor by Merger to Borg Warner Corporation(Defendant) | Arvinmeritor Inc(Defendant) | Argo Packing Co(Defendant) | Air & Liquid Systems Corp individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps Inc(Defendant) | Flowserve Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Duramentallic Corp Edward Valves and Pacific Pumps(Defendant) | Familian Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Familian Pipe & Supply(Defendant) | Eaton Corporation(Defendant) | Drilling Specialties Company LLC a division of ConocoPhillips Company(Defendant) | DCo LLC(Defendant) | Cummins Inc(Defendant) | Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc as successor in interest to Mundet Cork Company(Defendant) | Crosby Valve Inc(Defendant) | Goulds Pumps Inc(Defendant) | Metalclad Insulation LLC(Defendant) | Mobil Oil Corporation(Defendant) | Montello Inc(Defendant) | NIBCO Inc(Defendant) | NOV Inc individually and as successor in interest to Continental Emsco Drilling Products Inc Milwaukee Valve Mission Valves and Seals National Supply and Oil Well Supply(Defendant) | Parker Hannifin Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Sacomo Sierra Parker Seal Company and Rockwell Mechanical Packing(Defendant) | Shell Oil Company(Defendant) | Honeywell International Inc Individually and FKA Allied Signal Inc Successor in Interest to The Bendix Corporation(Defendant) | Lufkin Industries Inc(Defendant) | Marlo Incorporated(Defendant) | Mechanical Drives & Belting(Defendant) | SPX Flow Inc individually and as successor in interest to Waukesha Cherry Burrell and Waukesha Pumps(Defendant) | Sterling Fluid Systems USA LLC dha and individually and successor in interest to Peerless Pump Company and Indian Head Inc(Defendant) | Struthers Wells Corporation(Defendant) | The Darcoid Company of California(Defendant) | The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company(Defendant) | Viking Pump Inc(Defendant) | Twin Disc Inc(Defendant) | Union Carbide Corporation(Defendant) | Union Oil Company of California(Defendant) | Varco Valves and Controls Co(Defendant) | The Nash Engineering Company(Defendant) | Crown Cork & Seal Company Inc(Defendant) | ITT Inc(Defendant) | Crane Co(Defendant) | Crosby Valve Inc NKA Crosby Valve LLC(Defendant) | ExxonMobil Oil Corporation(Defendant) | Flowserve US Inc as successor in interest to Durametallic Corporation(Defendant) | Gardner Denver Inc(Defendant) | Sterling Fluid Systems USA LLC(Defendant) | DCo LLC(Defendant) | Morse Tec LLC(Defendant) | Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction Inc(Defendant) | Goulds Pumps Inc now known as Goulds Pumps LLC(Defendant) | National Oilwell Varco LP(Defendant) | Familian Corp(Defendant) | NOV Inc as successor in interest to Oilwell Supply Co(Defendant) | Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP(Defendant) | Conocophillips Company(Defendant) | Parker Hannifin Corporation(Defendant) | Flowserve US Inc solely as successor to Edward Valves Inc(Defendant) | Darcoid Company of California(Defendant) | NOV Inc successor in interest to National Supply Company(Defendant) | ITT LLC(Defendant) | FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump & Chicago Pump Businesses & its Former Chiksan Product Line(Defendant) | NOV Inc individually and as successor in interest to Mission Valves and Seats(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Drilling Specialties Company, L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases where ARVINMERITOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CROSBY VALVE LLC (DOE 5) is a litigant

Latest cases where CARLISLE CORPORATION is a litigant