This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 13:48:56 (UTC).

Thomas Tait vs. City Of Oxnard

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 Thomas Tait filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City Of Oxnard. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tait, Thomas

Defendant

City Of Oxnard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECK, ROBERT W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Tait, Thomas on 11/15/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served to City Clerk authorized to accept service) filed by Tait, Thomas on 08/28/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Tait, Thomas on 07/24/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Complaint filed by Tait, Thomas on 07/24/2017. Filed By: Tait, Thomas(Plaintiff) Refers To: City Of Oxnard(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BECK ROBERT W. LAW OFFICES OF