This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 14:51:43 (UTC).

Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey vs. 3M Company

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Massey, Randy

Massey, Kevin

Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey

Defendants

Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc

Belden Wire & Cable LLC

Paramount Pictures Corporation

Amcord Inc

Ballantyne Strong Inc individually as successor in interest to Strong Electric Corporation

SOCO West Inc

Paramount Studios Inc

Southland Lumber & Supply Co

3M Company

Calportland Co

CBS Studios Inc individually as successor in interest to CBS Paramount Television CBS Paramount Network Television CBS Television Studios Paramount Television Desilu Productions and CBS Productions

Viacomcbs Inc

Canoga Builders Supplies

WB Studio Enterprises Inc individually and as successor in interest to Warner Brothers Entertainment Inc

General Electric Company

NBCUniversal Media LLC

Kelly Moore Paint Company Inc

42 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fishback, Stephen M.

Defendant Attorneys

LONG, JAYME C

Peatman, Stephanie G

BERKES, ROBERT H

Other Attorneys

Goldberg, Karen B.

Milbrodt, Jeremy D

Fiola, N. Asir

Huynh, Elizabeth L.

MCCALL, MICHAEL T.

GOERGEN, MICHAEL S.

Lopez, Morgan K

RAMSEY, LAWRENCE R.

Carpenter, Erin

Shaffer, D Scott

BROSAMLE, ANTHONY D.

Duffy, Joseph

Hatem, Robert J

LANGBORD, PETER B

Ameele, Keith M.

CHUSID, BRUCE G

15 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Westwood Building Materials Co; Frontier Building Supply Co; Eaton Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Eaton Electrical Inc and Cutler Hammer Inc on 10/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service submitted by Massey, Kevin; Massey, Randy; Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey rejected on 09/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order (Joint) filed by Canoga Builders Supplies on 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order (Joint) filed by Canoga Builders Supplies on 09/21/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Defendant Southland Lumber & Supply Co ONLY) filed by Massey, Kevin; Massey, Randy; Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey on 09/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Defendant Techbestos Inc ONLY) filed by Massey, Kevin; Massey, Randy; Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey on 09/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Request for Jury Trial) filed by Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc on 09/16/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Request for Jury Trial) filed by Union Carbide Corporation on 09/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Errata (Regarding Proposed Case Management Order) filed by Canoga Builders Supplies on 09/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (Firm Address) filed by Strand Lighting LLC individually and as successor in interest to Strand Lighting Inc Century Lighting and Strand Electric Company on 07/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to strike entry - Answer (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Westwood Building Materials Co on 05/05/2021. is added to the case history.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Clerk and Order Thereon (Answer to First Amended Complaint - Submitted by Westwood Building Materials Co.) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 05/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Westwood Building Materials Co on 05/11/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Clerk and Order Thereon VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer (Demand for Jury Trial) filed by Westwood Building Materials Co on 05/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey; Massey, Randy; Massey, Kevin on 03/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey; Massey, Randy; Massey, Kevin on 03/19/2021. Filed By: Thelma Massey individually as Successor in Interest to Lon Massey(Plaintiff) | Massey, Kevin(Plaintiff) | Massey, Randy(Plaintiff) Refers To: 3M Company(Defendant) | Bardwell & Mcalister Industries Inc individually as successor in interest to Bardwell & Mcalister Inc(Defendant) | Ballantyne Strong Inc individually as successor in interest to Strong Electric Corporation(Defendant) | Amcord Inc(Defendant) | Altman Stage Lighting Company Inc(Defendant) | Bardwell & Mcalister Lighting Inc sued individually asa successor in interest to Bardwell & Mcalister and Bardwell & Mcalister Industries Inc(Defendant) | Bardwell & Mcalister Inc individually as successor in interest to Bardwell & Mcalister Industries Inc(Defendant) | Belden Wire & Cable LLC(Defendant) | Calportland Co(Defendant) | Canoga Builders Supplies(Defendant) | CBS Studios Inc individually as successor in interest to CBS Paramount Television CBS Paramount Network Television CBS Television Studios Paramount Television Desilu Productions and CBS Productions(Defendant) | Glendale Builders Supplies(Defendant) | General Electric Company(Defendant) | General Cable Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Carol Cable Company Inc(Defendant) | Frontier Building Supply Co(Defendant) | Fox Television Studios Inc(Defendant) | Ericsson Inc individually and as successor in interest to Anaconda Wire and Cable Company and Continental Wire and Cable Company(Defendant) | Electrical Switchgear Systems(Defendant) | Eaton Corporation individually and as successor in interest to Eaton Electrical Inc and Cutler Hammer Inc(Defendant) | Dale Plaine Inc(Defendant) | Cooper Industries LLC(Defendant) | Graybar Electric Company Inc(Defendant) | Kaiser Gypsum Company Inc(Defendant) | Hill Brothers Chemical Company(Defendant) | Leviton Manufacturing Co Inc(Defendant) | Keylite Production Services Inc(Defendant) | Keylite Preferred Distributing Inc(Defendant) | Kelly Moore Paint Company Inc(Defendant) | Metro Goldwyn Mayer Studios Inc(Defendant) | Mole Richardson Co LTD(Defendant) | Metalclad Insulation LLC(Defendant) | NBCUniversal Media LLC(Defendant) | Rockwell Automation Inc individually and as successor in interest to Allen Bradley Co LLC Allen Bradley Co Inc and Rostone Corporation(Defendant) | Paramount Studios Inc(Defendant) | Paramount Pictures Corporation(Defendant) | Osram Sylvania Inc(Defendant) | Mole Richardson Rentals(Defendant) | Schneider Electric USA Inc(Defendant) | Viacomcbs Inc(Defendant) | Universal City Studios LLC(Defendant) | Union Carbide Corporation(Defendant) | Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation(Defendant) | Westwood Building Materials Co(Defendant) | Westside Building Material Corporation(Defendant) | WB Studio Enterprises Inc individually and as successor in interest to Warner Brothers Entertainment Inc(Defendant) | Warner Bros Entertainment Inc(Defendant) | Techbestos Inc(Defendant) | Strand Lighting LLC individually and as successor in interest to Strand Lighting Inc Century Lighting and Strand Electric Company(Defendant) | Southland Lumber & Supply Co(Defendant) | SOCO West Inc(Defendant) | Carol Cable Company Inc(Defendant) | Dale Plaine Inc(Defendant) | WB Studio Enterprises Inc(Defendant) | Amcord Inc(Defendant) | Strand Lighting LLC(Defendant) | Rockwell Automation Inc(Defendant) | Ballantyne Strong Inc(Defendant) | Carol Cable Company(Defendant) | General Cable Corporation(Defendant) | CBS Studios Inc(Defendant) | PK&P Investment CO(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Southland Lumber & Supply Co is a litigant

Latest cases where BELDEN WIRE & CABLE COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PARAMOUNT STUDIOS INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BALLANTYNE STRONG INC. is a litigant