Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 08:52:25 (UTC).

The Green Law Group LLP vs. Kevin L Walker

Case Summary

On 02/10/2021 The Green Law Group LLP filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Kevin L Walker. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Green Law Group LLP

Defendant

Walker, Kevin L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Scott Thomas

Defendant Attorney

Gebelin, Steven T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Strike; Description: Special Motion to Strike (Code Civ. Proc. 425.16) of Defendant Kevin Walker; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Strike; Description: Special Motion to Strike (Code Civ. Proc. 425.16) of Defendant Kevin Walker; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (of Continued Hearing on Special Motion to Strike (Code Civ. Proc. 425.16) of Defendant Kevin Walker) filed by Walker, Kevin L on 07/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike - Special Motion to Strike (Code Civ. Proc. 425.16) of Defendant Kevin Walker scheduled for 08/11/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketObjection (to Supplemental Declaration of Kevin Walker Filed in Support of Defendants Special Motion to Strike) filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 07/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketReply (in Support of Special Motion to Strike (Code Civ. Proc. 425.16) of Defendant Kevin Walker; Memornadum in Support; Supplemental Declaration of Kevin Walker) filed by Walker, Kevin L on 07/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketSupplemental (Declaration of Kevin Walker in Support of Special Motion to Strike (Code Civ. Proc. 425.16)) filed by Walker, Kevin L on 07/13/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant's Special Motion to Strike Complaint (Anti-Slapp); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Scott T. Green; Declaration of Mike Khalilpour) filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 07/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike - Special Motion to Strike (Code Civ. Proc. 425.16) of Defendant Kevin Walker scheduled for 07/19/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 06/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Vacate Default of Defendant Kevin L. Walker and deem defendant served summons and complaint) filed by Walker, Kevin L; The Green Law Group LLP on 05/18/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions: (Second Cause of Action to Complaint (Trade Libel) ONLY) filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 05/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Walker, Kevin L on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 04/07/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 02/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 02/19/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 02/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 02/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by The Green Law Group LLP on 02/10/2021. Filed By: The Green Law Group LLP(Plaintiff) Refers To: Walker, Kevin(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Green Law Group LLP is a litigant