This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 09/25/2022 at 08:04:03 (UTC).

The Best Service Co Inc vs. Ignacio Tuyub

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 The Best Service Co Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ignacio Tuyub. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Best Service Co Inc

Defendants

Tuyub, Ignacio Jr

Tuyub, Marisol

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stapleton, Christopher

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Tuyub, Marisol on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDefault entered as to Tuyub, Ignacio Jr on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Court Judgment) filed by The Best Service Co Inc on 09/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Declarations in Support received on 08 31 2022) submitted by The Best Service Co Inc rejected on 08/31/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by The Best Service Co Inc on 07/27/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Marisol Tuyub, wife) filed by The Best Service Co Inc on 07/27/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by The Best Service Co Inc on 06/13/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by The Best Service Co Inc on 06/13/2022. Filed By: The Best Service Co Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Tuyub, Ignacio(Defendant) | Tuyub, Marisol(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BEST SERVICE CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stapleton, Christopher