This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 18:49:42 (UTC).

Terry Records vs. Pacific View of Ventura Inc

Case Summary

On 10/02/2014 Terry Records filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Pacific View of Ventura Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Records, Terry

Defendant

Pacific View of Ventura Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHMAN, JAY S

Defendant Attorneys

Blumberg, Robert S

Holmes, Michelle M

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Meet and Confer/Complete Item 19b of CMS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Arbitration Status Hearing; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 41

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/03/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Notice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Records, Terry on 03/03/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • Case Management Statement filed by Pacific View of Ventura Inc on 02/18/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Case Management Statement filed by Records, Terry on 02/13/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Answer filed by Pacific View of Ventura Inc on 11/14/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Khosraw Asadi, person in charge) filed by Records, Terry on 10/22/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/04/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Records, Terry on 10/02/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2014
  • Complaint filed by Records, Terry on 10/02/2014. Filed By: Records, Terry(Plaintiff) Refers To: Pacific View of Ventura Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less