This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 08:18:43 (UTC).

Tamara Mendez vs Countrywide Bank

Case Summary

On 04/30/2012 Tamara Mendez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Countrywide Bank. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Mendez, Tamara C

Mendez, Albert

Mendez, Tamara C.

Afzal, Ahmad

Rodriguez, Jose Carmen

Still, Cynthia Kay

Evans, Neville

Harms, Dale Norman

Gonzalez, Ramon

Rodriguez, Anabel

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Alternative Loan Trust 2007-0A8 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2007 0A8

Bank of America NA successor in interest to Countrywide Bank NA

Bank of America NA

Countrywide Bank NA

Afzal, Ahmad

Countrywide Bank, FSB

Countrywide Home Loans Inc

International Fidelity Insurance Co

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

The Bank of New York Mellon

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

International Fidelity Insurance Co

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Fobi, Emmanuel F.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Cadman, Payal K

Kim, Stella Y

SOSA, CARLOS E.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 11:46 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Time: 11:46 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 44; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: CMC: Service of Amended Complaint; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
198 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2012
  • Answer filed by International Fidelity Insurance Co on 05/24/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Agent: Rachel Utia for Genpact Registered Agent Inc) filed by Mendez, Albert; Mendez, Tamara C. on 05/17/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (sub serve Megan Pepe) filed by Mendez, Albert; Mendez, Tamara C. on 05/17/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served to Rachel Utria for Genpact Registered Agent Inc) filed by Mendez, Albert; Mendez, Tamara C. on 05/11/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Margaret Wilson agent) filed by Mendez, Albert; Mendez, Tamara C. on 05/09/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Mendez, Albert; Mendez, Tamara C. on 04/30/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 44.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mendez, Tamara C.; Mendez, Albert on 04/30/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Mendez, Tamara C.; Mendez, Albert on 04/30/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Complaint filed by Mendez, Tamara C.; Mendez, Albert on 04/30/2012. Filed By: Mendez, Tamara C.(Plaintiff) | Mendez, Albert(Plaintiff) Refers To: Bank of America NA successor in interest to Countrywide Bank NA(Defendant) | Countrywide Bank NA(Defendant) | The Bank of New York Mellon(Defendant) | Alternative Loan Trust 2007-0A8 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates Series 2007 0A8(Defendant) | Countrywide Home Loans Inc(Defendant) | Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc(Defendant) | Afzal, Ahmad(Defendant) | International Fidelity Insurance Co(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less