This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/22/2021 at 11:41:17 (UTC).

Swift Financial LLC vs. Pool Expertz Inc

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 Swift Financial LLC filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Pool Expertz Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Swift Financial LLC

Respondents

VonAllmen, James

Pool Expertz Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Schlecter, Daren M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Description: Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (CLM) - Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 02/26/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAmount of 60.00 received for 36D - Motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing on 02/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketMotion - Other (Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award) filed by Swift Financial LLC on 01/29/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (by substituted service by serving Pravin Patel , clerk on 12-03-2020) filed by Swift Financial LLC on 12/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (by serving Pravin Patel , clerk /owner on 12-03-2020) filed by Swift Financial LLC on 12/09/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Swift Financial LLC on 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm, Correct, or Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (Alternative Dispute Resolution) filed by Swift Financial LLC on 11/19/2020. Filed By: Swift Financial LLC(Petitioner) Refers To: Pool Expertz Inc(Respondent) | VonAllmen, James(Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swift Financial LLC as Servicing Agent for Webbank is a litigant