Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 14:52:55 (UTC).

Susann Molnar

Case Summary

On 06/18/2014 Susann Molnar was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Juvenile Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-OXN

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Juvenile Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Conservator

Friend, Angelique

Conservatee

Molnar, Susann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservator Attorney

Rodriguez, Amber A

Other Attorneys

SHEA, MARY C

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition - Other (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Account and Report (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PR); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Hearing re General Plan / Appraisal and Inventory (PRC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Petition for Appointment of Conservator; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: J6; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Hearing Re: Annual/Biennial Status Report; Description: Due 09/01/17; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Petition - Other (PRC); Description: Petition For Order Approving Second Account and Report of Conservator and Request for Waiver of Futu...; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Oxnard; Department: J6

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2014
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Ex Parte - Ex Parte Petition for Appointment of Temporary Conservator of the Person and Estate scheduled for 06/19/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Ex Parte Petition to Appoint Temporary Conservator (Of The Person and Estate) filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/18/2014. Filed By: Friend, Angelique(Proposed Conservator) Refers To: Molnar, Susann(Proposed Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Conservator - Conservatorship of the Person and Estate scheduled for 09/02/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Case assigned to Department J6.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Citation issued on 06/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Confidential Conservator Screening Form filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Confidential Supplemental Information filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Capacity Declaration - Conservatorship filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/18/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator (Of The Person and Estate) filed by Friend, Angelique on 06/18/2014. Filed By: Friend, Angelique(Conservator of Person and Estate) Refers To: Molnar, Susann(Conservatee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA, MARY C