This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 20:41:50 (UTC).

Sunstate Equip vs Civil Construction

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Sunstate Equip filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Civil Construction. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunstate Equipment Co LLC

Defendant

Civil Construction Associates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gaba, Rodolfo Jr

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketWrit issued on 02/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs $0.00; Credits to Interest $0.00; Credits to Principal $0.00; Accrued Interest $549.18) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 02/08/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Notice of Entry of Judgment) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 09/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Or Order (Judgment dated 08/30/21) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 09/22/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJudgment for Sunstate Equipment Co LLC against Civic Construction Associates in the amount of: 15779.61 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 568.00 costs, 1391.04 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 08/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 08/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Rqst for Default; Decs in Support; Dismissal; Summary of Case & Proposed Judgment) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 08/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment - CCP585 (of Rodolfo Gaba Jr) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 08/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous (Summary of Case) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 08/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of Does (1-100) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 08/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Civic Construction Associates on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 08/30/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (by serving Jasmine Kaur / Clerk) filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 07/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sunstate Equipment Co LLC on 05/20/2021. Filed By: Sunstate Equipment Co LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Civil Construction Associates(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Civil Construction Associates is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNSTATE EQUIPMENT CO. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO