This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/28/2023 at 07:00:57 (UTC).

Sunbelt Rentals Inc vs. Wickham Group Inc

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Sunbelt Rentals Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wickham Group Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sunbelt Rentals Inc

Defendants

2580 Main Street LLC

Aitken Birdsall Trustee of the Birdsall Trust

Citizens Business Bank as successor by merger to County Commerce Bank

Don L Carlton Trustee of the Don L Carlton Family Revocable Trust

Gary Carlton Trustee of the Gary L Carlton Revocable Trust

Wickham Group Inc

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2023
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc on 01/24/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served upon Myrna L. Disanto, Agent for Service) filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc on 12/27/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to Don L Carlton Trustee of the Don L Carlton Family Revocable Trust Dated January 10, 1997) filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc on 12/20/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc on 11/30/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sunbelt Rentals Inc on 11/30/2022. Filed By: Sunbelt Rentals Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: 2580 Main Street LLC(Defendant) | Don L Carlton Trustee of the Don L Carlton Family Revocable Trust Dated January 10 1997(Defendant) | Aitken Birdsall Trustee of the Birdsall Trust Dated September 13 1991(Defendant) | Citizens Business Bank as successor by merger to County Commerce Bank(Defendant) | Wickham Group Inc(Defendant) | Gary Carlton Trustee of the Gary L Carlton Revocable Trust Dated May 20 1999(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less