This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 06:34:42 (UTC).

Strassburg Gilmore & Wei LLP vs. Peyman & Rahnama Inc

Case Summary

On 09/04/2015 Strassburg Gilmore Wei LLP filed an Other lawsuit against Peyman Rahnama Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Strassburg Gilmore & Wei LLP

Defendants

Carrillo Surgery Center

Medstar Funding

Mendez, Sarah

Mid Valley Imaging

Morales, Elliot

Oxnard Sport & Spine Physical Therapy

Palms Imaging Medical Group Inc

Peachtree Funding Northeast LLC

Peyman & Rahnama Inc

Solomon, Kenneth

Specialized Orthopedic Solutions

The Spine and Orthopedic Center

Wood MD APC, Robert

Law Offices of Peyman and Rahnama Inc

Carrillo Surgery Center Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strassburg, Justin K

Defendant Attorneys

Connell, Gregory A

RAHNAMA, PEJMAN

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Status Conference; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Description: 3 day court trial; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Conference; Description: Re Disposition of the Case; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Status Conference; Description: Re Disposition of the Case; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Description: for Discharge and Release from Interpleader Action CCP 386; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2016
  • Answer filed by Law Offices of Peyman and Rahnama Inc on 01/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Law Offices of Peyman and Rahnama Inc added as a Defendant effective 01/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (summons and complaint, etc.) filed by Strassburg Gilmore & Wei LLP on 01/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Strassburg, Justin K on 01/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Acknowledgement and Receipt (signed by Michael Rodden) filed by Strassburg Gilmore & Wei LLP on 01/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • Case Management Statement filed by Strassburg Gilmore & Wei LLP on 01/19/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/03/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Strassburg Gilmore & Wei LLP on 09/04/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Complaint in Interpleader filed by Strassburg Gilmore & Wei LLP on 09/04/2015. Filed By: Strassburg Gilmore & Wei LLP(Plaintiff) Refers To: Law Offices of Peyman and Rahnama Inc(Defendant) | Carrillo Surgery Center Inc(Defendant) | Peyman & Rahnama Inc(Defendant) | Solomon, Kenneth(Defendant) | Peachtree Funding Northeast LLC(Defendant) | Wood MD APC, Robert(Defendant) | Medstar Funding(Defendant) | The Spine and Orthopedic Center(Defendant) | Oxnard Sport & Spine Physical Therapy(Defendant) | Carrillo Surgery Center(Defendant) | Mid Valley Imaging(Defendant) | Specialized Orthopedic Solutions(Defendant) | Palms Imaging Medical Group Inc(Defendant) | Morales, Elliot(Defendant) | Mendez, Sarah(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDSTAR FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPINE ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS CENTRAL FLORIDA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONNELL, GREGORY A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAHNAMA PEJMAN ESQ.