This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:18:44 (UTC).

Stevens vs Fischer Searl

Case Summary

On 09/12/2016 Stevens filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fischer Searl. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stevens, Charles

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Fischer Searl, Jody

Suretec Insurance Company

Guardado, Fernando Hernandez

Boyd, Don Jean

Capital Lumber Company

Progressive Business Corporation

Searl, Doug

American Contractors Indemnity Company Inc

Stevens, Charles Chuck

American Contractors Indemnity Company

ROES 1 through 20

Zoes 1 through 100 inclusive

Alpine Interiors Corporation

Suretec Insurance Company Inc

Moes 1-500

Plycem USA LLC

Lorenzana Construction Inc

Lorenzana, Ruben

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

NIEBOW, STEVEN N

Skocypec, Ronald J.

HUDSON, GEOFFREY R.

CAMPBELL, NICK M

GROSFELD, ROBERT

Lawrence, Lisa I.

HUDSON, BLAKE A

GIBSON, ROBERT E

Sherman, Drew H.

Shackelford, Ricky Lynn

Barba, Arnold

Bergsten, Robert T

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Skocypec, Ronald J.

HUDSON, GEOFFREY R.

CAMPBELL, NICK M

GROSFELD, ROBERT

Lawrence, Lisa I.

HUDSON, BLAKE A

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to all Cross Defendants; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service of Amended Complaint or Amended Cross-Complaint and Default and/or Responsive Pleading as to; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 2:45 PM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: 22; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
335 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2016
  • Reply (to Plaintiffs Opposition to Demurrer to Complaint memorandum of points and authorities in support thereof) filed by Fischer Searl, Jody on 12/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Opposition (to demurrer) filed by Stevens, Charles on 11/23/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Demurrer (CLM) - to Complaint; Memo of p&a's in support thereof; Decl of Ronald J. Skocypec; Exhibits scheduled for 12/08/2016 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Amount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 11/14/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Demurrer (to Complaint; Memo of p&a's in support thereof; Decl of Ronald J. Skocypec; Exhibits) filed by Fischer Searl, Jody on 11/14/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Stevens, Charles on 10/14/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/10/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stevens, Charles on 09/12/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • Complaint filed by Stevens, Charles on 09/12/2016. Filed By: Stevens, Charles(Plaintiff) Refers To: Fischer Searl, Jody(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less