This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 17:00:20 (UTC).

Steven A Perez vs. Quinlan Moran

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 Steven A Perez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Quinlan Moran. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Perez, Steven A

Defendants

Moran, Jaqueline R

Moran, Noel

Moran, Quinlan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nolan, Patrick S

Genzuk, Joshua A

Algorri, Mark S

Defendant Attorney

Humphrey, Craig A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference; Description: Order to Show Cause RE: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketMandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - Order to Show Cause RE: Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney Within Firm filed by Perez, Steven A on 05/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Moran, Quinlan; Moran, Jaqueline R; Moran, Noel on 05/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer (Demand for Trial by Jury) filed by Moran, Quinlan; Moran, Jaqueline R; Moran, Noel on 05/04/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Aiden Moran, Brother; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Perez, Steven A on 04/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Aiden Moran, Son; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Perez, Steven A on 04/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Aiden Moran, Son; STATEMENT OF DAMAGES) filed by Perez, Steven A on 04/26/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Perez, Steven A on 02/02/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Perez, Steven A on 12/21/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Perez, Steven A on 12/21/2021. Filed By: Perez, Steven A(Plaintiff) Refers To: Moran, Jaqueline(Defendant) | Moran, Quinlan(Defendant) | Moran, Noel(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOLAN PATRICK S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GENZUK JOSHUA AARON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Algorri, Mark S