This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 02:19:06 (UTC).

Stephanie Velasquez vs. Peter Arellano

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 Stephanie Velasquez filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Peter Arellano. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velasquez, Stephanie

Defendant

Arellano, Peter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bayley, Guy R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned (Fully Satisfied) filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 10/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketWrit issued on 09/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 09/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJudgment for Velasquez, Stephanie against Arellano, Peter in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 09/08/2021. Possession Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court (Possession Only) filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 09/08/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk submitted by Velasquez, Stephanie rejected on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Arellano, Peter on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (Clerks Judgment) filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Prejudgment Claim) filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 08/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 07/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketVelasquez, Stephanie Application for Waiver granted in full.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketApplication/Request for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 07/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 27.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 07/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 07/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint filed by Velasquez, Stephanie on 07/27/2021. Filed By: Velasquez, Stephanie(Plaintiff) Refers To: Arellano, Peter(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAYLEY GUY RICHARD