Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 15:15:56 (UTC).

State Farm vs. Wilhelm

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 State Farm filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Wilhelm. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant

Wilhelm, Spencer Michael David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Description: re: Failure to File Default Judgment; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2015
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2014
  • Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Publication (served John Doe tenant) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 12/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 11/19/2014 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/21/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • Court orders sanctions against Richard L Mahfouz in the sum of $300.00, payable to Court by 12/19/2014. Reason: Failure to serve w/in 60 days (CRC 3.110)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2014
  • Tentative Ruling published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • Case Management Statement filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 11/06/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 11/19/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 06/27/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 06/27/2014. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Wilhelm, Spencer(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less