This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/28/2021 at 00:00:17 (UTC).

State Farm vs Oseguera Villalobos

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 State Farm filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Oseguera Villalobos. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendants

Oseguera Villalobos, German Eduardo

Villalobos, German Eduardo Oseguerra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L

Defendant Attorney

Buttry, William G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Villalobos, German Eduardo Oseguerra on 04/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Villalobos, German Eduardo Oseguerra on 04/14/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 04/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer filed by Villalobos, German Eduardo Oseguerra on 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketVillalobos, German Eduardo Oseguerra added as a Defendant effective 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (served Sergio Melendez, Co occupant. Date of service is 8/10/2020) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 08/25/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/26/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 08/05/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 08/05/2020. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Oseguera Villalobos, German(Defendant) | Villalobos, German(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUTTRY WILLIAM GEARHART