This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 20:26:30 (UTC).

State Farm Mutual vs. Chavez

Case Summary

On 10/06/2016 State Farm Mutual filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Chavez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Chavez, Gustavo

Cross Defendants

Hernandez, Luis

Flores, Gustavo Ibarra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mahfouz, Richard L

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

NETTELS, CHARLES F.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2017
  • Hernandez, Luis added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/28/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Flores, Gustavo Ibarra added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/28/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Answer filed by Chavez, Gustavo on 02/28/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • NETTELS, CHARLES F. added as a effective 02/28/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • Declaration - Other (of Shelby Poteet in Response to Order to Show Cause Re; Failure to Serve) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 02/24/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Case Management Statement filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 02/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/03/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 10/06/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 10/06/2016. Filed By: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Chavez, Gustavo(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less