This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:19:57 (UTC).

Spear vs Mastrolonardo

Case Summary

On 09/13/2016 Spear filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mastrolonardo. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent / Appellee

Spear, Teresa K

Defendant and Appellant

McKenzie, Jacqueline Mastrolonardo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent / Appellee Attorney

Reed, Darren G

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Case Management Conference; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 4:00 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 4:00 PM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 43; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Compel; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 21; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2017
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Spear, Teresa K on 03/15/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Notice - Other (of Continued Case Management Conference) filed by Spear, Teresa K on 02/09/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 02/08/2017 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 03/22/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Case Management Statement filed by Spear, Teresa K on 01/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens) filed by Spear, Teresa K on 10/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/08/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Spear, Teresa K on 09/13/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Complaint filed by Spear, Teresa K on 09/13/2016. Filed By: Spear, Teresa K(Plaintiff) Refers To: McKenzie, Jacqueline(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less