This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 19:29:24 (UTC).

Simi Village Homeowners Association vs. Stephanie A Jensen

Case Summary

On 09/09/2016 Simi Village Homeowners Association filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Stephanie A Jensen. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Simi Valley Homeowners Association

Defendant

Jensen, Stephanie A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Writ issued on 07/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Abstract issued on 05/02/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Judgment for Simi Village Homeowners Association against Jensen, Stephanie A in the amount of: 2231.56 principal, punitive damages, 228.50 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 02/27/2017. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 02/27/2017 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2017
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Non Service; Cost: 59.50) filed by Simi Valley Homeowners Association on 01/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (RESET) (to 2/27/2017 at 9:00am S1) filed by Simi Valley Homeowners Association on 12/09/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 02/27/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration to Reset current Small Claims hearing date) filed by Simi Valley Homeowners Association on 12/09/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (RESET) (Until 12/19/16 9:00am CRS1) filed by Simi Valley Homeowners Association on 10/13/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 12/19/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Non Service; Plaintiff's Claim & Order; Cost: 59.50) filed by Simi Valley Homeowners Association on 10/13/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 10/24/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Simi Valley Homeowners Association on 09/09/2016. Filed By: Simi Valley Homeowners Association(Plaintiff) Refers To: Jensen, Stephanie(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less