This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 14:32:50 (UTC).

Sima Amir Mogadam vs. Jason Randall Schmysker

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Sima Amir Mogadam filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jason Randall Schmysker. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    East County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mogadam, Sima Amir

Defendant

Schmysker, Jason Randall

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/01/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service (Plaintiff's Claim and Order; Home address, per resident the "Mendez" Family has lived at address for 1 year and does not know defendant; Cost: 35.00) filed by Mogadam, Sima Amir on 07/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Request - Other (For Interpreter) filed by Mogadam, Sima Amir on 06/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (RESET) filed by Mogadam, Sima Amir on 06/28/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 08/01/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant Unserved ($15.00, Certified mailing returned Unclaimed) filed by Mogadam, Sima Amir on 06/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (RESET) filed by Mogadam, Sima Amir on 05/24/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 07/25/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Mogadam, Sima Amir on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Request - Other (for Interpreter) filed by Mogadam, Sima Amir on 04/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 06/06/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Mogadam, Sima Amir on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Mogadam, Sima Amir(Plaintiff) Refers To: Schmysker, Jason(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less