This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/03/2022 at 07:01:29 (UTC).

Shetty vs. J P Morgan Chase Bank

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 Shetty filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against J P Morgan Chase Bank. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shetty, Niki Alexander

Defendants

Fidelity National Title Company

J P Morgan Chase Bank NA

Quality Loan Services Corp

Redwood Holdings LLC

JPMorgan Chase Bank N A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D Attaray, Mainak

Defendant Attorney

GOULDING, DANIEL J.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 2:28 PM; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketPast Events; Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint - Amended (FIRST) filed by Shetty, Niki Alexander on 05/27/2022. Filed By: Shetty, Niki Alexander(Plaintiff) Refers To: Redwood Holdings LLC(Defendant) | Quality Loan Services Corp(Defendant) | J P Morgan Chase Bank NA(Defendant) | Fidelity National Title Company(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 05/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (CLM) - scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 21 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketJPMorgan Chase Bank N A added as a Defendant effective 05/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Jacqueline Foroutan Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 430.41) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A on 05/02/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice (Supporting Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N A's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A on 05/02/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDemurrer (Memorandum of Points an Authorities in Support thereof) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank N A on 05/02/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Notice of Qualitys Declaration of Nonmonetary Status and Qualitys Declaration of Nonmonetary Status) filed by Quality Loan Services Corp on 04/29/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration re: Additional 30 Days to File Responsive Pleading CCP 430.41 filed by Fidelity National Title Company on 04/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Documents; Event Type: Order of Reassignment; Event Time: 2:28 PM; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Order of Reassignment heard 04/07/2022 02:28:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 21 effective 04/07/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketObjection (to Notice of Related Case; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support; (Proposed) Order) filed by Redwood Holdings LLC on 04/05/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action submitted by Shetty, Niki Alexander rejected on 03/30/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Case #56-2022-00562622-CL-UD-VTA) filed by Shetty, Niki Alexander on 03/24/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shetty, Niki Alexander on 03/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Shetty, Niki Alexander on 03/21/2022. Filed By: Shetty, Niki Alexander(Plaintiff) Refers To: Quality Loan Services Corp(Defendant) | Fidelity National Title Company(Defendant) | Redwood Holdings LLC(Defendant) | J P Morgan Chase Bank NA(Defendant) | JPMorgan Chase Bank N A(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ATTARAY MAINAK