Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 04/07/2021 at 00:01:52 (UTC).

Sherwood Country Club vs County of Ventura

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 Sherwood Country Club filed an Other lawsuit against County of Ventura. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherwood Country Club

Defendants

Dan Goodwin Ventura County Assessor County Clerk Recorder

County of Ventura

County of Ventura Assessment Appeals Board No 2

Dan Goodwin Ventura County Assessor

Assessment Appeals Board of the County of Ventura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lebeau, Michael T

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, LEROY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Other (to Continue Case Management Conference) filed by Sherwood Country Club on 03/12/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by County of Ventura; Dan Goodwin Ventura County Assessor on 03/02/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Sherwood Country Club on 02/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by County of Ventura; Dan Goodwin Ventura County Assessor on 09/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDan Goodwin Ventura County Assessor added as a Defendant effective 09/29/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Assessment Appeals Board of the County of Ventura on 09/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAssessment Appeals Board of the County of Ventura added as a Defendant effective 09/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Anne Hall - Deputy Clerk of the Board) filed by Sherwood Country Club on 09/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Anne Hall - Deputy Clerk of the Board) filed by Sherwood Country Club on 09/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (Served Monica Sanchez) filed by Sherwood Country Club on 09/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/05/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sherwood Country Club on 07/23/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Sherwood Country Club on 07/23/2020. Filed By: Sherwood Country Club(Plaintiff) Refers To: County of Ventura Assessment Appeals Board No 2(Defendant) | County of Ventura(Defendant) | Dan Goodwin Ventura County Assessor County Clerk Recorder(Defendant) | Assessment Appeals Board of the County of Ventura(Defendant) | Dan Goodwin Ventura County Assessor(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sherwood Country Club is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lebeau, Michael T