This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/15/2018 at 14:33:49 (UTC).

Sheree E Fletcher vs. D & G Homes Inc

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 Sheree E Fletcher filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against D G Homes Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fletcher, Sheree E

Defendants

Paradise Property Management

D & G Homes Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Ring, Robert A

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's OSC Re: SANCTIONS; Description: for D&G Homes failure to appear; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • Past Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: RESCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 12/21/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2016
  • Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 09/21/2016 08:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 10/21/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Case Management Statement filed by D & G Homes Inc on 09/09/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Case Management Statement filed by Fletcher, Sheree E on 09/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • Answer filed by D & G Homes Inc on 06/17/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Dennis F. Fredericks-agent for serv C/O Martin Vorbrodt-associate auth to accept) filed by Fletcher, Sheree E on 05/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Fletcher, Sheree E on 05/20/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Complaint filed by Fletcher, Sheree E on 04/26/2016. Filed By: Fletcher, Sheree E(Plaintiff) Refers To: D & G Homes Inc(Defendant) | Paradise Property Management(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARADISE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ring, Robert A