This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 11/23/2020 at 05:03:02 (UTC).

Sheila Stillie vs. Ebbie Ganji

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 Sheila Stillie filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ebbie Ganji. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stillie, Sheila

Defendant

Ganji, Ebbie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fortunati, Christopher A

Defendant Attorney

PETERS, LAURIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint (Counter Claim) submitted by Ganji, Ebbie rejected on 11/06/2020. Filed By: Ganji, Ebbie(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING (Answer) filed by Ganji, Ebbie on 10/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ganji, Ebbie on 10/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPETERS, LAURIE added as a effective 10/22/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Stillie, Sheila on 10/05/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/16/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stillie, Sheila on 09/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Stillie, Sheila on 09/24/2020. Filed By: Stillie, Sheila(Plaintiff) Refers To: Ganji, Ebbie(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less