This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 18:06:40 (UTC).

She Engineering vs City of Thousand Oaks

Case Summary

On 12/24/2012 She Engineering filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against City of Thousand Oaks. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

She Engineering & Construction Inc

City of Thousand Oaks

Custom Home Remodeling & Roofing Inc

Allana Buick & Bers Inc

Custom Home Remolding & Roofing Inc

Roes 75 - 100

Simpson Gumpertz & Heger Inc

The Hanover Insurance Company Inc

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

City of Thousand Oaks

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Dekel, Jonathan E

WALKER, JOHN J.

NOONAN, TRACY M.

OERTEL, MARK A.

STELLWAGEN, ROBERT H

Campbell, Scott H

VEIS, DAVID C.

Cross Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

NOONAN, TRACY M.

Campbell, Scott H

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion For Order (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 12:00 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 4:43 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion For Order (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Request to Enter Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 12:00 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
238 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2013
  • Allan Buick & Bers Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • Answer filed by City of Thousand Oaks on 02/25/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • Certified copy of Order Changing Venue filed by She Engineering & Construction Inc on 12/24/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • Certified copy of Register of Actions filed filed by She Engineering & Construction Inc on 12/24/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • Receipt for Papers re: Change of Venue/Transfer received on 12.24.12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • Transfer in from Los Angeles County. Original file date: 9.14.12. Original Case number: BC492100.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • Miscellaneous (Motion for Change of Venue) filed by City of Thousand Oaks on 12/24/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 06/12/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 42.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2012
  • Complaint filed by She Engineering & Construction Inc on 12/24/2012. Filed By: She Engineering & Construction Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: City of Thousand Oaks(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less