This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 13:13:33 (UTC).

Sharp Bookkeepers Inc vs. Shave It Nation Inc

Case Summary

On 09/19/2016 Sharp Bookkeepers Inc filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Shave It Nation Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Ventura County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Kasakoff, LLoyd

Disabatino, Arla

Sharp Bookkeepers Inc

The Ice Bar Cafe Simi Valley

Hamilton Ragnar Inc

The Ice Bar Cafe Camarillo

Cool Beans Camarillo

Cool Beans Simi Valley

The Flying Pig Camarillo

The Flying Pig Simi Valley

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Neilsen, Nicole

Shave It Nation Inc

Shave It Inc

Bain, Karen

Kudirka, Lisa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hixon, Matthew

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Ghilezan, R. Michael

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause (CCM); Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ex Parte; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Time: 1:42 PM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Set Aside Default; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 40; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
114 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2016
  • Ex Parte Application - Other (for a Temporary Restraining Order & and OSC Re Issuance of A Preliminary Injunction) filed by Shave It Nation Inc on 10/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Summons issued on 10/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Shave It Nation Inc on 10/26/2016. Filed By: Shave It Nation Inc(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Sharp Bookkeepers Inc(Cross - Defendant) | Kasakoff, LLoyd(Cross - Defendant) | DiSabatino, Arla(Cross - Defendant) | The Ice Bar Cafe Simi Valley(Cross - Defendant) | The Ice Bar Cafe Camarillo(Cross - Defendant) | The Flying Pig Simi Valley(Cross - Defendant) | The Flying Pig Camarillo(Cross - Defendant) | Cool Beans Simi Valley(Cross - Defendant) | Cool Beans Camarillo(Cross - Defendant) | Hamilton Ragnar Inc(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • Complaint - Amended (First; for Damages) filed by Sharp Bookkeepers Inc; Disabatino, Arla; Kasakoff, LLoyd on 10/04/2016. Filed By: Sharp Bookkeepers Inc(Plaintiff) | Kasakoff, LLoyd(Plaintiff) | DiSabatino, Arla(Plaintiff) Refers To: Shave It Nation Inc(Defendant) | Shave It Inc(Defendant) | Bain, Karen(Defendant) | Kudirka, Lisa(Defendant) | Neilsen, Nicole(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Minutes finalized for heard 09/26/2016 01:42:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/17/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 02/17/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sharp Bookkeepers Inc; Kasaoff, LLoyd; Disabatino, Arla on 09/19/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Complaint filed by Sharp Bookkeepers Inc; Kasaoff, LLoyd; Disabatino, Arla on 09/19/2016. Filed By: Sharp Bookkeepers Inc(Plaintiff) | Kasakoff, LLoyd(Plaintiff) | DiSabatino, Arla(Plaintiff) Refers To: Shave It Nation Inc(Defendant) | Shave It Inc(Defendant) | Bain, Karen(Defendant) | Kudirka, Lisa(Defendant) | Neilsen, Nicole(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less