This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/09/2018 at 14:17:30 (UTC).

Shamour Enterprises vs Fredy's Ceramic Tile

Case Summary

On 05/22/2008 Shamour Enterprises filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fredy's Ceramic Tile. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Ventura Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shamour Enterprises, Inc. assignee for Argenta Ceramic, S.L.

Defendants

Cabrera, Irma Juarez

Fredy's Ceramic Tile

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODMAN, KENNETH B.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Department: 22B; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2011
  • Past Events - Event Type: Miscellaneous Hearing (CCM); Description: Status Hearing re: Filing of Default Judgment; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385; Description: file dismissal on complaint pursuant to Notice of Conditional Settlement; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (LC); Description: 1 Day Estimated time,; Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 1:30 PM; Location: Ventura; Department: 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • Past Events - Event Type: Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2008
  • Past Events - Event Type: Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement); Event Status: VACATED; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2017
  • Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2008
  • Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 10/31/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2008
  • Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 10/30/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 10/30/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • Answer filed by Cabrera, Irma Juarez on 07/14/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2008
  • Cabrera, Irma Juarez added as a Defendant effective 07/14/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2008
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Irma Carerra, authorized to accept) filed by Shamour Enterprises, Inc. assignee for Argenta Ceramic, S.L. on 06/26/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • Case assigned to Department 43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Shamour Enterprises, Inc. assignee for Argenta Ceramic, S.L. on 05/22/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shamour Enterprises, Inc. assignee for Argenta Ceramic, S.L. on 05/22/2008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2008
  • Complaint filed by Shamour Enterprises, Inc. assignee for Argenta Ceramic, S.L. on 05/22/2008. Filed By: Shamour Enterprises, Inc. assignee for Argenta Ceramic, S.L.(Plaintiff) Refers To: Cabrera, Irma(Defendant) | Fredy's Ceramic Tile(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODMAN KENNETH BRIAN