This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/13/2018 at 15:37:36 (UTC).

Serenade at Riverpark LLC vs. Imelda Carreon

Case Summary

On 10/19/2012 Serenade at Riverpark LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Imelda Carreon. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Serenade at Riverpark

Defendants

Carreon, Imelda

Macaraeg, Mario

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Document - Event Type: Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 20; Document: Tentative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: Claim of Exemption - Wage Garnishment (CLM); Description: Imelda Carreon; Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2017
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2015
  • DocketCase reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2014
  • DocketSatisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (FULL) filed by Serenade at Riverpark on 12/29/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • DocketWrit has been updated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2014
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned (Full Satisfaction) filed by Serenade at Riverpark on 08/26/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2014
  • DocketCheck# 5620002743 in amount of $30.00 issued to Fast Eviction Service on 6/24/14. DP# 1906115451

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2014
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketDefault entered as to Macaraeg, Mario on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketDefault entered as to Carreon, Imelda on Complaint.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment. Including all unknown occupants) filed by Serenade at Riverpark LLC on 11/05/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants (by subserving Imelda Carreon) filed by Serenade at Riverpark LLC on 11/05/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Serenade at Riverpark LLC on 11/05/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • DocketProof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Serenade at Riverpark LLC on 11/05/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Serenade at Riverpark LLC on 10/19/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketDeclaration for Court Assignment filed by Serenade at Riverpark LLC on 10/19/2012.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed by Serenade at Riverpark LLC on 10/19/2012. Filed By: Serenade at Riverpark(Plaintiff) Refers To: Carreon, Imelda(Defendant) | Macaraeg, Mario(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMOTHY B. LIEGAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW - LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B.