This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/31/2022 at 04:50:12 (UTC).

Serdy vs. Alnasser

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 Serdy filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alnasser. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Respondent / Appellee and Plaintiff

Serdy, Shay

Defendants and Appellants

Sumaya 369 LLC

Dr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser

Perry Craig Wander Esq

Wander, Perry C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent / Appellee and Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS, JAMES L.

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Price, Stuart W

Wander, Perry C

 

Court Documents

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion to Quash Service of Summons; Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 8:47 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Event Time: 3:22 PM; Department: 42; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Completion of Transcripts on Appeals VENTURA generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketRecord on Appeal (Status CERTIFIED, version number 1) certified re appeal filed by Dr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser; Sumaya 369 LLC on 09/09/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketClerk's Transcript complete (O+1, 3 Volumes) on 11/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDefault of Sumaya 369 LLC; Dr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser rescinded.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketappeal defaulted due to .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Cost of Preparing Clerk's Transcript on Appeal VENTURA generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDefault of Sumaya 369 LLC; Dr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser rescinded.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser appeal defaulted due to Failure to Pay Costs for Reporter's Transcripts.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCounter Designation of Record on Appeal (Clerks transcript) filed by Serdy, Shay on 10/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Dr Sumayyah Alnasser in Support of Motion to Quash Service of Process) filed by Dr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser; Sumaya 369 LLC on 01/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Stuart W Price in Support of Motion to Quash Service of Process) filed by Dr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser; Sumaya 369 LLC on 01/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons - Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support scheduled for 02/03/2021 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash Service of Summons (Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support) filed by Dr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser; Sumaya 369 LLC on 01/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketPrice, Stuart W added as a effective 01/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 08/06/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 42.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (56-2020-00544681-CU-OR-VTA) filed by Serdy, Shay on 10/05/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Serdy, Shay on 10/05/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Serdy, Shay on 10/05/2020. Filed By: Serdy, Shay(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sumaya 369 LLC(Defendant) | Dr. Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser(Defendant) | Perry Craig Wander Esq(Defendant) | Wander, Perry(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less