This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/31/2022 at 04:52:02 (UTC).

Serdy vs. Alnasser

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 Serdy filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Alnasser. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Serdy, Shay

Sumaya 369 LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Sumaya369 LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Dr Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser

Sumaya 369 LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Sumaya369 LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Dr Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser

Serdy, Shay

Khthlan, Mohamad Al

Alkhathlan, Mohammed Abdullah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

REYNOLDS, JAMES L.

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Price, Stuart W

REYNOLDS, JAMES L.

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court's Motion (CLM); Event Time: 10:54 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Motion - Other (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Tentative

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Tentative

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Demurrer (CLM); Event Time: 8:20 AM; Department: 41; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Sumaya369 LLC on 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketSumaya369 LLC added as a Defendant effective 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Dr Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser on 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Alkhathlan, Mohammed Abdullah on 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAlkhathlan, Mohammed Abdullah added as a Cross - Defendant effective 05/13/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketSubpoenaed record submitted by Ontraport on 04/14/2022 created

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketSummons issued on 04/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by Serdy, Shay on 04/12/2022. Filed By: Serdy, Shay(Cross - Complainant) Refers To: Khthlan, Mohamad(Cross - Defendant) | Dr Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser(Cross - Defendant) | Alkhathlan, Mohammed(Cross - Defendant) | Sumaya369 LLC(Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketKhthlan, Mohamad Al added as a Cross - Defendant effective 04/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer (to Cross Complaint) filed by Serdy, Shay on 04/12/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMotion - Other (CLM) - Motion to Stay and for Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $1500.00 scheduled for 12/08/2020 at 08:20:00 AM in 41 at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 11/05/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 11/05/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMotion - Other (and Motion to Stay and for Attorney's Fees in the Amount of $1500.00; Memorandum in Support; Request for Judicial Notice; and Declaration of Stuart W Price) filed by Dr Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser; Sumaya 369 LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company on 11/05/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Errata (re Notice of Pendency of Action) filed by Serdy, Shay on 10/21/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by Serdy, Shay on 10/06/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Serdy, Shay on 08/24/2020.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Serdy, Shay on 08/24/2020. Filed By: Serdy, Shay(Plaintiff) Refers To: Dr Sumayyah Ibrahim Alnasser(Defendant) | Sumaya 369 LLC a Delaware Limited Liability Company(Defendant) | Sumaya369 LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less