This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 05/14/2018 at 14:55:30 (UTC).

Scott Crane vs. Jonathan Stewart

Case Summary

On 06/19/2014 Scott Crane filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jonathan Stewart. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, East County Courthouse located in Ventura, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-SIM

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crane, Scott

Defendants

McCartney, Amber L

Stewart, Jonathan

 

Court Documents

Minutes

Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Document - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Time: 9:00 AM; Department: S1; Document: Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Past Events - Event Type: Court Trial (SC); Event Status: HEARD; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Location: Simi Valley; Department: S1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Writ has been updated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • Writ of Execution Returned (Partially satisfied) filed by Crane, Scott on 04/28/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2015
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Full) filed by Crane, Scott on 01/15/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Writ issued on 09/23/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest ($0.00, costs, $0.00 credit, $31.35 Interest) filed by Crane, Scott on 09/23/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2014
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Judgment for Crane, Scott against Stewart, Jonathan ;McCartney, Amber L in the amount of: 2000.00 principal, punitive damages, 114.00 costs, pre-judgment interest, and attorney fees entered on 07/28/2014. None

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SC) heard 07/28/2014 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2014
  • The Court finds judgment on Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court FOR Scott Crane and AGAINST Jonathan Stewart, Amber L McCartney in the amount of $2000.00 principal, $114.00 costs. Judgment Details: None. Sub Disposition type After Hearing - Judgment uncontested.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute (service to Jonathan Stewart on 6-26-14, cost of $25.00) filed by Crane, Scott on 07/10/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2014
  • Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal (on 6-26-14, cost $39.00) filed by Crane, Scott on 07/10/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Court Trial (SC) - scheduled for 07/28/2014 at 09:00:00 AM in S1 at Simi Valley.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Case assigned to Department S1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Crane, Scott on 06/19/2014. Filed By: Crane, Scott(Plaintiff) Refers To: Stewart, Jonathan(Defendant) | McCartney, Amber(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less