This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 08/17/2022 at 00:02:40 (UTC).

Scott A Berlin vs. Western Auto Experts Inc

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Scott A Berlin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Western Auto Experts Inc. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Berlin, Scott A

Defendants

Forest River Inc

Sentry Select Insurance Company

US Bancorp

Western Auto Experts Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rohr, Barbara A

Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY, THOMAS M.

Meissner, Alexander G

Roeb, Craig A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Strike; Description: Portions of plaintiffs complaint; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Location: Ventura; Department: 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketReply (in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint) filed by Western Auto Experts Inc on 08/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketOpposition (to Defendant Western Auto Experts Inc dba Barber RVs Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint) filed by Berlin, Scott A on 08/04/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike - Portions of plaintiffs complaint scheduled for 08/17/2022 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketAmount of 435.00 received for 195 - Answer or other 1st paper on 07/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike (portions of plaintiff's complaint; Declarations of Chelsea L Zwart) filed by Western Auto Experts Inc on 07/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Forest River Inc on 07/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Forest River Inc on 07/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 10-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (to Kirby Barber - Sales Manager, Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Berlin, Scott A on 07/01/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CT Corporation John Montijo Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Berlin, Scott A on 06/30/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer filed by Sentry Select Insurance Company on 06/28/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent John Montijo of CT Corp) filed by Berlin, Scott A on 06/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Agent John Montijo of CT Corp) filed by Berlin, Scott A on 06/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served CSC Lawyers Lai Saevang Authorized to Accept Service) filed by Berlin, Scott A on 06/16/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Venue) filed by Berlin, Scott A on 05/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Berlin, Scott A on 05/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketComplaint filed by Berlin, Scott A on 05/20/2022. Filed By: Berlin, Scott A(Plaintiff) Refers To: Western Auto Experts Inc(Defendant) | US Bancorp(Defendant) | Sentry Select Insurance Company(Defendant) | Forest River Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Bancorp is a litigant

Latest cases where Forest River, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sentry Select Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meissner, Alexander G