This case was last updated from Ventura County Superior Courts on 02/03/2021 at 17:52:18 (UTC).

Sarah Bdairat vs. Priscilla Alexis Perez

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Sarah Bdairat filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Priscilla Alexis Perez. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts, Ventura Hall Of Justice located in Ventura, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-VTA

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Ventura, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bdairat, Sarah

Defendants

Perez, Juan

Perez, Priscilla Alexis

Assignee

May, Garrett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Buchanan, Ryan

Defendant Attorney

Bale, Heather M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketPast Events - Event Type: MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default; Event Status: SCHEDULED; Event Time: 8:15 AM; Location: Ventura; Department: 22B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Bdairat, Sarah on 07/21/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Bdairat, Sarah on 07/17/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Perez, Priscilla Alexis; Perez, Juan on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees filed by Perez, Juan; Perez, Priscilla Alexis on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer filed by Perez, Juan; Perez, Priscilla Alexis on 06/10/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 07/31/2020 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 41.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bdairat, Sarah on 02/26/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint filed by Bdairat, Sarah on 02/26/2020. Filed By: Bdairat, Sarah(Plaintiff) Refers To: Perez, Priscilla(Defendant) | Perez, Juan(Defendant) | May, Garrett(Assignee)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BUCHANAN, RYAN